Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Francis

Bishop Emeritus of Sivagangai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1930 BornSendamaram
25 Mar 195726.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 198757.1AppointedBishop of Sivagangai, India
30 Aug 198757.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sivagangai, India
1 Sep 200575.2RetiredBishop of Sivagangai, India

MicroData Summary for Edward Francis:
Bishop Edward Francis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sivagangai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sivagangai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Jul 2014