Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antony Pappusamy

Archbishop of Madurai, India

Apostolic Administrator of Palayamkottai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1949 Born
7 Jul 197626.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 199849.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madurai, India
5 Nov 199849.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
4 Feb 199949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
10 Nov 200354.1AppointedBishop of Dindigul, India
26 Jul 201464.8AppointedArchbishop of Madurai, India
29 Jun 201868.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Palayamkottai, India

MicroData Summary for Antony Pappusamy
Archbishop Antony Pappusamy (born ) Archbishop of Madurai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarambady
Ordained BishopOpen Air, In front of, Our Lady of Dolours, Cathedral, Madurai, Archdiocese of Madurai

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Madurai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,468
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2014
  • ab: CB, 29 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast