Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Manziana, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1902BornUrago Mella
20 Nov 192321.4ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
2 Jan 192724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
19 Dec 196361.5AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
2 Feb 196461.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
26 Sep 198179.2RetiredBishop of Crema, Italy
2 Jun 199794.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Manziana:
Bishop Carlo Manziana C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crema

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013