Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Attilio Cardinal Nicora

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Priest of San Filippo Neri in Eurosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1937Born
27 Jun 196427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Apr 197740.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Apr 197740.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
28 May 197740.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
11 Feb 198749.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Jun 199255.2AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
18 Sep 199760.5ResignedBishop of Verona, Italy
1 Oct 200265.5AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
1 Oct 200265.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
21 Oct 200366.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Filippo Neri in Eurosia
21 Oct 200366.5Elevated to Cardinal
13 Dec 200366.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Filippo Neri in Eurosia
2 Apr 200568.0CeasedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
21 Apr 200568.0ConfirmedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
7 Jul 201174.3ResignedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
12 Jun 201477.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Filippo Neri in Eurosia
22 Apr 201780.0DiedPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Attilio Nicora (VIAF: 7516851)
Attilio Cardinal Nicora (born , died ) President Emeritus of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • ab: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • d: CB, 22 Apr 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017