Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Merisi

Bishop Emeritus of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1938 Born
27 Feb 197132.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Sep 199556.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Sep 199556.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
4 Nov 199557.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
14 Nov 200567.1AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
17 Dec 200567.2InstalledBishop of Lodi, Italy
26 Aug 201475.9RetiredBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Merisi
Bishop Giuseppe Merisi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviglio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestSantuario della Madonna delle Lacrime, Treviglio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lodi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,631
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017