Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Stucchi

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Horrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1941 Born
28 Jun 196624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Apr 200462.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Apr 200462.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea
5 Jun 200462.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea

MicroData Summary for Luigi Stucchi
Bishop Luigi Stucchi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSulbiate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,608
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017