Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giudici

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1940Born
27 Jun 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Jun 199050.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Jun 199050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
29 Jun 199050.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
1 Dec 200363.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
11 Jan 200463.8InstalledBishop of Pavia, Italy
16 Nov 201575.6RetiredBishop of Pavia, Italy
18 Jan 202483.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary
Giovanni Giudici
Bishop Giovanni Giudici
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Nascente, Cathedral Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Nascente, Cathedral Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceCircolo, Hospital, Varese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,284
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2015
  • d: CB, 18 Jan 2024
  • loc: AM, 8 Feb 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025