Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eugenio Cardinal Tosi, O.Ss.C.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1864BornBusto Arsizio
4 Jun 188723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 Oct 188925.4ProfessedPriest of Oblates of Saints Ambrose and Charles
5 Apr 191146.9AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
16 Apr 191146.9Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
22 Mar 191752.8AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
7 Mar 192257.8AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Dec 192258.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 192258.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
7 Jan 192964.6DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Tosi:
Eugenio Cardinal Tosi O.Ss.C.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
  • a cardinal for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 39
  • ob: CB, 12 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,970

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015