Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luigi Mistò

Official of the Secretariat for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1952 Born
12 Jun 197623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Jul 201159.0AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
14 Apr 201562.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Mistò (VIAF: 165769909)
Father Luigi Mistò (born ) Official of Economy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBinago, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Secretariat for the Economy.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2015
  • loc: AM, 12 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast