Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Hubert

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1739BornQuébec
20 Jul 176627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
14 Jun 178546.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
14 Jun 178546.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
19 Nov 178647.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
4 Jun 178849.2SucceededBishop of Québec, Canada
1 Sep 179758.5ResignedBishop of Québec, Canada
17 Oct 179758.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Hubert:
Bishop Jean-François Hubert (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Québec

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78, and Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 26
  • c1: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016