Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Barry

Deceased

Bishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1841Born
5 Aug 186625.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 189958.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
30 Sep 189958.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thugga
11 Feb 190058.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thugga
7 Aug 190261.3SucceededBishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
19 Jan 192078.8DiedBishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Barry
Bishop Thomas Francis Barry (born , died ) Bishop of Chatham

EventPlace
Birth PlacePokemouche

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198, and Page 551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018