Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Dollard (Dullard)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1789Born
12 Oct 181727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
30 Sep 184252.8AppointedBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
11 Jun 184353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada
29 Aug 185161.7DiedBishop of Saint John in America, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Dollard (Dullard)
Bishop William Dollard (Dullard) (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John in America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBathkyram, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Québec, Diocese of Québec

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast