Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Baltes

Deceased

Bishop of Alton, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1827Born
31 May 185326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Sep 186942.4AppointedBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA
23 Jan 187042.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA
15 Feb 188658.8DiedBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Baltes
Bishop Peter Joseph Baltes (born , died ) Bishop of Alton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnsheim, Germany
Ordained PriestMontreal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Belleville
Death PlaceAlton, Diocese of Alton, Illinois

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017