Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas James Conaty

Deceased

Bishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California

Note/Previous Titular See: (Rector/Catholic University of America)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1847BornKilnaleck, Ireland
21 Dec 187225.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 190154.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
24 Nov 190154.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
27 Mar 190355.7AppointedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
18 Sep 191568.1DiedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas James Conaty:
Bishop Thomas James Conaty (born , died ) Bishop of Monterey-Los Angeles

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 392, and Page 497
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013