Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles LaRocque

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1809Born
29 Jul 183222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
20 Mar 186656.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
29 Jul 186656.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
31 Jul 186656.7InstalledBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
15 Jul 187565.6DiedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles LaRocque (VIAF: 14302848)
Bishop Charles LaRocque (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambly, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean-d’Iberville, Church, Iberville, Archdiocese of Québec
Death PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Hôtel-Dieu, Chapel, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 21
  • obd/c1/i: CB, 18 Sep 2017
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast