Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Xavier Norbert Blanchet

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Oregon City, Oregon

Titular Archbishop of Amida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1795BornSt-Pierre, Canada
19 Jul 181923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
1 Dec 184348.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Oregon Territory, USA
1 Dec 184348.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
7 May 184448.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Draso
25 Jul 184549.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Draso
24 Jul 184650.9AppointedBishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
31 May 185054.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Walla Walla, Oregon, USA
29 Jul 185054.9AppointedArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
29 Jul 185357.9ResignedBishop of Walla Walla, Oregon, USA
12 Dec 188085.3RetiredArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
4 Feb 188185.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
18 Jun 188387.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Oregon City, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Norbert Blanchet:
Archbishop Francis Xavier Norbert Blanchet (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oregon City

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 427
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 596
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 179, and Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013