Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Rodilossi

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1807Born
18 Sep 183022.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 185547.5AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
25 Mar 185547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
16 Dec 187871.2DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Rodilossi
Bishop Gaetano Rodilossi (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopXII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,855, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast