Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Olivier Briand

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1715Born
16 Mar 173924.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 176650.9AppointedBishop of Québec, Canada
16 Mar 176651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Québec, Canada
29 Nov 178469.8ResignedBishop of Québec, Canada
25 Jun 179479.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Olivier Briand
Bishop Jean-Olivier Briand (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlérin, France

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,766, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 644, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast