Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro

Dioecesis Tursiensis-Lacunerulonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Anglona
11th CenturyErectedDiocese of Anglona (erected)
1310Territory AddedDiocese of Tursi (suppressed) Diocese of Anglona
Diocese of Anglona-Tursi
8 August 1545Name ChangedDiocese of Anglona Diocese of Anglona-Tursi
14 May 1949Territory AddedDiocese of Tricarico (Montalbano Jˇnico and Craco) Diocese of Anglona-Tursi
2 July 1954Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Anglona-Tursi (from Acerenza e Matera)
21 August 1976Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Anglona-Tursi (from Matera)
8 September 1976Territory LostDiocese of Anglona-Tursi (Alessandria del Garretto, Amendolara, Canna, Montegiordano, Nocara, Oriolo, Rocca Imperiale, and Rosito Capo Spulico) Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio
8 September 1976Territory LostDiocese of Anglona-Tursi (Lagonegro, Latronico, Lauria, Maratea, Nemoli, Rivello, and Trecchina) Diocese of Policastro
8 September 1976Territory AddedArchdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo (Moliterno and Sarconi) Diocese of Anglona-Tursi
8 September 1976Territory LostDiocese of Anglona-Tursi (Craco, Montalbano Ionico, and Scansano Ionico) Diocese of Matera
Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro
8 September 1976Name ChangedDiocese of Anglona-Tursi Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Anglona-Tursi
188683,647.0%239040OTC
1959118,000118,80099.3%715761,55258459ap1960
1969115,148117,49898.0%56562,0568854ap1971
Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro
1980127,900137,00093.4%7217891,4371711065ap1981
1988133,116134,09999.3%7324971,37212513671ap1991
1999131,665132,56599.3%6920891,4792110071ap2000
2000131,500132,50099.2%7220921,429219571ap2001
2001131,500132,50099.2%7019891,4773219071ap2002
2002131,500132,50099.2%7216881,4943189071ap2003
2003131,500132,50099.2%6614801,6433168871ap2004
2004131,500132,50099.2%6712791,6645148772ap2005
2010124,942125,94299.2%6713801,5617146481ap2011
2014127,100128,20099.1%748821,550696482ap2015
2017124,000125,60098.7%754791,569765775ap2018
2020124,942125,94299.2%794831,505654372ap2021
2022124,942125,94299.2%764801,561664072ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Anglona
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 90, and Page 91
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 89
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 109
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 850
  • Diocese of Anglona-Tursi
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 86
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 84
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 75
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 55
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 41, Page 428, and Page 429
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 522, to Page 524
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 593, and Page 594
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 675, to Page 677
  • Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 677, and Page 678

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 27 Apr 2024