Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Pignatelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1719BornNapoli
22 Sep 174223.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 175939.8AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
4 Jun 175939.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
24 Jan 176343.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
24 Jul 177859.0ResignedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
1 Mar 177959.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pignatelli:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Pignatelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1766
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 84, and Page 137
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013