Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis de Fenollet

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1466AppointedBishop of Anglona, Italy
13 Feb 1467AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
27 Jan 1468AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Anglona, Italy
14 Sep 1471AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
22 Mar 1476AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Capaccio, Italy
Jul 1476²DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Fenollet
Archbishop Louis de Fenollet (died Jul 1476) Bishop of Capaccio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 203, and Page 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 89, and Page 114
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1466, Number 40*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast