Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Saverio Poli

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1768BornMolfetta
24 Mar 179224.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 182456.4SelectedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
20 Dec 182456.8ConfirmedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
21 Dec 182456.8Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
29 Jun 183668.3ResignedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
9 Feb 184172.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Saverio Poli:
Bishop Giuseppe Saverio Poli (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1828
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013