Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Vecchioni, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1739BornNapoli
18 Dec 176223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Dec 177839.0AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
20 Dec 177839.0Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
28 Oct 181878.8DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Vecchioni:
Bishop Salvatore Vecchioni C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013