Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Petroni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1881BornCervicati
5 Jul 190826.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 193048.8AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
31 Aug 193048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
1 Apr 193553.5AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
1 Apr 193553.5AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
5 Oct 196685.0RetiredBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
5 Oct 196685.0RetiredBishop of Venosa, Italy
5 Oct 196685.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae
30 Nov 197089.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae
2 Feb 197896.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Petroni:
Bishop Domenico Petroni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013