Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilio Capece Scondito

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1682BornNapoli
24 Sep 171230.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 173552.4AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
30 Jan 173552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
30 Oct 176280.2DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guilio Capece Scondito:
Bishop Guilio Capece Scondito (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013