Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pulvirenti

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1871BornAci Sant’Antonio
27 Nov 191140.0AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
17 Dec 191140.1Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
19 Aug 192250.7AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
11 Sep 193361.8DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pulvirenti:
Bishop Giovanni Pulvirenti (born , died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013