Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Cattaneo, O.Ss.C.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1872BornSaronno
15 Sep 192350.9AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
16 Sep 192350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
6 Jul 192855.7AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
21 Oct 192856.0InstalledBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 Jul 193663.7DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Cattaneo:
Bishop Ludovico Cattaneo O.Ss.C.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013