Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flavio Galletti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1646AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
5 Aug 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
26 Nov 1653DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Flavio Galletti:
Bishop Flavio Galletti O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015