Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Sirufo

Archbishop of Acerenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1961 Born
3 Aug 198625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
20 May 201655.3AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
20 Aug 201655.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
3 Sep 201655.6InstalledArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sirufo (VIAF: 162572017)
Archbishop Francesco Sirufo (born ) Archbishop of Acerenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelluccio Inferiore
Ordained BishopPiazza Maria Santissima di Anglona, prčs la Cattedrale, Tursi, Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Acerenza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 9 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 26 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,076

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast