Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Vozzi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (1972-1982 Cava)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1905Born
25 Jul 192822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
25 Sep 195347.7AppointedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
30 Nov 195347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
25 Sep 197266.7AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
30 Jan 198276.1RetiredArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
20 Feb 198882.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Vozzi
Archbishop Alfredo Vozzi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiaromonte

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast