Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Giacobazio (Giacovazzi)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1595AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
1 May 1595Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
5 May 1600AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
1605²ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
1609²ResignedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
12 Apr 1612³DiedBishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Giacobazio (Giacovazzi)
Bishop Ascanio Giacobazio (Giacovazzi) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 170
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 110
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast