Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rocco Talucci

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi-Ostuni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1936 BornVenosa
23 Jul 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
25 Jan 198851.4AppointedBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
25 Mar 198851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
5 Feb 200063.4AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi-Ostuni, Italy
8 Apr 200063.6InstalledArchbishop of Brindisi-Ostuni, Italy
20 Oct 201276.1RetiredArchbishop of Brindisi-Ostuni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rocco Talucci:
Archbishop Rocco Talucci (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi-Ostuni

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,806
  • bd: CB, 17 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014