Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Coccini

Deceased

Bishop of Imola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornRoma
15 Jan 163851.0AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
24 Jan 163851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
19 Feb 164659.1AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
1652¹65.0DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Coccini:
Bishop Marco Antonio Coccini , Bishop of Imola

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84, and Page 209
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015