Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo

Archidioecesis Potentinus-Muranus-Marsicensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Agostino Superbo, Archbishop
  • Ennio Appignanesi, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,634 (631 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Basilicata
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesipotenza.it/
  • Mailing Address: Largo Duomo 5, 85100 Potenza, Italia
  • Telephone: 0971.41.17.06
  • Fax: 0971.26.535

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Potenza
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Potenza (erected)
Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
27 June 1818UnitedDiocese of Marsico Nuovo
Diocese of Potenza
Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
Archdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
11 February 1973ElevatedDiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo Archdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
21 August 1976ElevatedArchdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo (became a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Muro Lucano
Archdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
Archdiocese of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
195087,05087,050100.0%6524899783613625ap1951
1970111,457.0%54399304621833ap1971
Archdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
1980133,400136,40097.8%6433971,3753520142ap1981
Archdiocese of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo
1990153,800154,80099.4%68381061,45034022057ap1991
1999152,000152,60099.6%72311031,475133317859ap2000
2000152,000152,60099.6%73311041,461133313559ap2001
2001178,000180,00098.9%77301071,663183213061ap2002
2002173,500175,00099.1%78321101,577203312061ap2003
2003151,200152,00099.5%84411251,209195123061ap2004
2004151,200152,00099.5%82371191,270198620061ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014