Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thaddeus Amat y Brusi, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1810Born
16 Jan 183423.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
23 Dec 183726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
29 Jul 185342.5AppointedBishop of Monterey, California, USA
12 Mar 185443.1Ordained BishopBishop of Monterey, California, USA
29 Jul 187362.5AppointedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
12 May 187867.3DiedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Amat y Brusi (VIAF: 28776698)
Bishop Thaddeus Amat y Brusi C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Monterey-Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Spain
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propagande, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 162, Number 891
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017