Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Mora y Borrell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monterey-Los Angeles, California

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1827BornGurb, Spain
19 Mar 185628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey, California, USA
20 May 187345.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
20 May 187345.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
3 Aug 187345.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
12 May 187850.4SucceededBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
13 Mar 189668.3ResignedBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
6 May 189668.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
3 Aug 190577.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mora y Borrell:
Archbishop Francisco Mora y Borrell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monterey-Los Angeles

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 305, and Page 392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 395
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1868, Page 40, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015