Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Verdaguer y Prat

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1835Born
12 Dec 186227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
25 Jul 189054.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA
25 Jul 189054.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
9 Nov 189054.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
26 Oct 191175.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Pedro Verdaguer y Prat
Bishop Pedro Verdaguer y Prat (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Brownsville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Torello, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 132
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017