Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bernard MacGinley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monterey-Fresno, California

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1871BornCroagh, Ireland
8 Jun 189523.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 191038.6AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
10 May 191038.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
24 Mar 192452.6AppointedBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
26 Sep 193261.1ResignedBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
26 Sep 193261.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
18 Oct 196998.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA

MicroData Summary for John Bernard MacGinley:
Bishop John Bernard MacGinley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monterey-Fresno

  • a priest for 74.4 years
  • a bishop for 59.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013