Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Vicente Garcia Diego y Moreno, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1785Born
21 Dec 180217.2ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
13 Nov 180823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Observant Friars Minor
14 Nov 180823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Apr 184054.6AppointedBishop of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México
4 Oct 184055.0Ordained BishopBishop of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México
30 Apr 184660.6DiedBishop of California (Two Californias, Both Californias), México

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Vicente Garcia Diego y Moreno (VIAF: 62792216)
Bishop Francisco José Vicente Garcia Diego y Moreno O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of California (Two Californias, Both Californias)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Daga, Lagos de Moreno

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018