Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Austin

Dioecesis Austiniensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joe Steve Vásquez, Bishop
  • John Edward McCarthy, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 15 November 1947
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Texas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 57,424 (19,511 Square Miles)
  • Description: Mills, Hamilton, San Saba, Lampasas, Coryell, McLennan, Limestone, Bell, Falls, Robertson, Mason, Llano, Burnet, Williamson, Milam, Brazos, Blanco, Travis, Bastrop, Lee, Burleson, Washington, Hays, and Caldwell Counties and the part of Fayette county north of the Colorado River.
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: AUS
  • Official Web Site: http://www.austindiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: 6225 E. Highway 290 East, Austin, TX 78723-1023, USA
  • Telephone: (512)949-2401
  • Fax: 949-2524

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
15 November 1947ErectedDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of Galveston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Austin (erected)
16 October 1961Territory LostDiocese of Amarillo
Diocese of Austin
Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth
Diocese of El Paso
Diocese of San Angelo (erected)
29 December 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Austin (from San Antonio)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195078,662810,6409.7%5642988026020555ap1951
1959117,512874,67713.4%8349132890161238109ap1960
1966129,825820,10915.8%976115882113024677ap1967
1970138,224835,37616.5%926816086312825378ap1971
1976139,080939,60014.8%92561489399721081ap1977
1980147,8671,029,90014.4%93511441,02658119084ap1981
1990210,4311,727,00012.2%103601631,29063104131126ap1991
1999350,0001,915,39218.3%117511682,0831493811895ap2000
2000350,0002,028,39117.3%116541702,058149108119126ap2001
2001400,0002,077,19219.3%124932171,84318196108127ap2002
2002400,1562,056,55019.5%126531792,23517798108126ap2003
2003401,5412,178,50718.4%140481882,13517396102127ap2004
2004401,8422,300,86317.5%157482051,96019197102101ap2005
2006422,0062,397,02817.6%155542092,019187104102125ap2007
2012518,9402,809,63618.5%176542302,2562109797101ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013