Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thaddeus Anthony Shubsda

Deceased

Bishop of Monterey in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1925Born
26 Apr 195025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
20 Dec 197651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
20 Dec 197651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tragurium
19 Feb 197751.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tragurium
26 May 198257.1AppointedBishop of Monterey in California, USA
26 Apr 199166.0DiedBishop of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Anthony Shubsda
Bishop Thaddeus Anthony Shubsda (born , died ) Bishop of Monterey in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles, CA

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast