Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles Pius Montgomery, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1830Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Nov 1849AppointedBishop of Monterey, California, USA
1850¹ResignedBishop-Elect of Monterey, California, USA
9 Apr 1860DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Charles Pius Montgomery
Father Charles Pius Montgomery O.P. (died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

  • a priest for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016