Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Elias Garcia

Bishop of Monterey in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1960 Born
30 Jan 198827.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Austin, Texas, USA
28 May 198827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Austin, Texas, USA
21 Jan 201554.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Austin, Texas, USA
21 Jan 201554.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
3 Mar 201554.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
27 Nov 201858.2AppointedBishop of Monterey in California, USA
29 Jan 201958.4InstalledBishop of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Elias Garcia (VIAF: 7438211)
Bishop Daniel Elias Garcia (born ) Bishop of Monterey in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCameron, Diocese of Austin, Texas
Ordained BishopSaint Williams, Church, Round Rock, Diocese of Austin, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Monterey in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2015
  • ob/c1: CB, 21 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,379
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2018
  • i: CB, 27 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 29 Nov 2018

Quantcast