Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Eugene Wilkerson

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Vincennes

Apostolic Administrator of Monterey in California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1939 Born
5 Jan 196525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Nov 199758.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Nov 199758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vincennes
21 Jan 199858.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vincennes
21 Jul 201575.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
20 Jul 201878.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Monterey in California, USA
29 Jan 201979.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Eugene Wilkerson
Bishop Gerald Eugene Wilkerson (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDes Moines, IA, Diocese of Des Moines, Iowa
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Grace, Church, Encino, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,224
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2015
  • ab: CB, 19 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast