Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Joseph Willinger, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monterey in California, USA

Titular Bishop of Tiguala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1886Born
15 Jun 190519.1EnteredMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Aug 190620.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jul 191125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Mar 192942.8AppointedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
28 Oct 192943.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
12 Dec 194660.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
12 Dec 194660.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
3 Jan 195366.7SucceededBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
16 Oct 196781.4RetiredBishop of Monterey-Fresno, California, USA
16 Oct 196781.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiguala
25 Jul 197387.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Monterey in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Joseph Willinger (VIAF: 89465270)
Bishop Aloysius Joseph Willinger C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monterey in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD
Ordained PriestEsopus, NY
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Church, Brooklyn, NY, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cemetery, Fresno, CA

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 80
  • ente/c1/loc: CB, 29 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Jan 2019

Quantcast