Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramon Bejarano

Auxiliary Bishop of San Diego, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Carpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1969 Born
15 Aug 199829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Stockton, California, USA
27 Feb 202050.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Diego, California, USA
27 Feb 202050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpi
14 Jul 202050.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpi

MicroData Summary for Ramon Bejarano
Bishop Ramon Bejarano (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeagraves, TX, Diocese of Amarillo, Texas
Ordained BishopImmaculata, Church, San Diego, Diocese of San Diego, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Diego.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2020
  • bp/c1/ob: CB, 27 Feb 2020
  • ob: CB, 10 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jul 2020

Quantcast