Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kiely Gorman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1892BornPasadena
23 Jun 191724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
24 Apr 193138.6AppointedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
22 Jul 193138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
8 Feb 195259.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
8 Feb 195259.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhasus
19 Aug 195461.9SucceededBishop of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas, USA
22 Aug 196976.9RetiredBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
22 Aug 196976.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
21 Jan 197178.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
16 Aug 198087.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kiely Gorman:
Bishop Thomas Kiely Gorman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dallas

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1931, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015