Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Melbourne

Archidioecesis Melburnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Denis James Hart, Archbishop
  • Peter John Elliott, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Vincent Long Van Nguyen, O.F.M. Conv., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Hilton Forrest Deakin, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 31 March 1874
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 27,194 (10,503 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.cam.org.au/
  • Mailing Address: James Goold House, 228 Victoria Parade, East Melbourne, Vic. 3002; P.O. Box 146, Vic. 8002, Australia
  • Telephone: (03)9926.5677
  • Fax: 9926.5617

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Melbourne
25 June 1847ErectedArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Melbourne (erected)
30 March 1874Territory LostDiocese of Melbourne Diocese of Ballarat (erected)
30 March 1874Territory LostDiocese of Melbourne Diocese of Sandhurst (erected)
Archdiocese of Melbourne
31 March 1874ElevatedDiocese of Melbourne Archdiocese of Melbourne
10 May 1887Territory LostArchdiocese of Melbourne Diocese of Sale (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Melbourne
1950303,5711,130,00026.9%2252074327026471,815125ap1951
1966530,4972,354,65022.5%3873607477108519,312184ap1967
1968633,6522,295,84127.6%4003537538417952,265193ap1971
1980793,0002,823,00028.1%4183337511,0558042,378220ap1981
1990876,6083,087,20028.4%3823357171,22217451,634235ap1991
1999995,7973,365,17329.6%3412946351,5685501,323232ap2000
2000995,7973,365,17329.6%3363116471,53915941,461232ap2001
2001995,7973,365,17329.6%3312806111,62915701,418232ap2002
20021,012,7973,489,00029.0%3332786111,6575531,545232ap2003
20031,029,1823,518,62729.2%3242585821,7685711,545232ap2004
20041,029,1823,518,62729.2%3212625831,7654291,561230ap2005
20101,085,0003,844,00028.2%3002615611,93415051,232219ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014