Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Angelo Grech

Deceased

Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1948Born
30 Nov 197425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
27 Nov 199849.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
27 Nov 199849.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Belesasa
10 Feb 199950.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belesasa
8 Mar 200152.2AppointedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
27 Apr 200152.3InstalledBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
27 Dec 201062.0DiedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Angelo Grech
Bishop Joseph Angelo Grech (born , died ) Bishop of Sandhurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalzan, Malta

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,476
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast