Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Neil Cullinane

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

Titular Bishop of Flumenzer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1920Born
22 Jul 194423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
13 Jan 195938.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canberra (and Goulburn), Australia
13 Jan 195938.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenzer
18 Mar 195938.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenzer
29 Nov 196747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
18 Aug 197453.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
13 Aug 200079.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Neil Cullinane
Bishop John Neil Cullinane (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParkes

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 17
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast